Garner v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: George W Garner
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00236
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John A Dalimonte terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/12/19. (cs)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by George W Garner. (Crowell, Ashley) Modified on 12/11/2019 (jla).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/10/19. (rtc)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/9/19. (cs)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Paul L. Stoller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/27/19. (cs)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Ashley C. Crowell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/27/19. (cs)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Paul L. Stoller,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1743972) by George W Garner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bossier, Sheila)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Ashley Carrington Crowell,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1743966) by George W Garner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bossier, Sheila)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/12/19. (cs)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard North, Jr., MOTION to Substitute Attorney Elizabeth Ross Hadley by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sheila M. Bossier on behalf of George W Garner (Bossier, Sheila)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Richard B. North, Jr, Paul Lincoln Stoller, John A Dalimonte, Ashley Crowell (jtm)
October 25, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P. Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 MDL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Discovery Orders, #4 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #5 Daubert Orders, #6 Motions in Limine Orders, #7 Deposition Designation Orders, #8 Miscellaneous Orders, #9 Master and Short-Form Pleadings) (jtm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03218. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 24, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-03218-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16927768 filed by George W Garner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W Garner
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Ashley Crowell
Represented By: Sheila M. Bossier
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Represented By: Ashley C. Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?