Manogin v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Manogin
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00239
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Richard B. North, Jr, Adam W Krause, Robert L Kinsman (jtm)
October 25, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P. Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 MDL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Discovery Orders, #4 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #5 Daubert Orders, #6 Motions in Limine Orders, #7 Deposition Designation Orders, #8 Miscellaneous Orders, #9 Master and Short-Form Pleadings) (jtm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-04134. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 24, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-04134-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16983814 filed by Pamela Manogin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manogin v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Manogin
Represented By: Adam W Krause
Represented By: Robert L Kinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?