Wiggs v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jerry Lynn Wiggs
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00240
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith S. Carlton on behalf of Jerry Lynn Wiggs (Carlton, Keith)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith S. Carlton on behalf of Jerry Lynn Wiggs Andrew M. Saul served on 11/13/2019. (Carlton, Keith)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith S. Carlton on behalf of Jerry Lynn Wiggs Andrew M. Saul served on 11/26/2019. (Carlton, Keith)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Andrew M. Saul (jla)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Returned to attorney for service. (jwr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300025009, filed by Jerry Lynn Wiggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggs v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lynn Wiggs
Represented By: Bobby R. Wood
Represented By: Keith S. Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?