Carr v. Elliott et al
Plaintiff: Gary Carr
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Marshall Hollis, Endo International PLC, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Charles Elliott, M.D., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Akorn, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., John Does 1-10, Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00246
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Mississippi Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-46116, filed 12/09/2019. (jtm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. of Conditional Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Conditional Transfer Order) (Thomas, Stephen)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/3/19. (bnd)
November 29, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Maron, David)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/25/19. (bnd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Halbert, Mark)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Halbert, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 State Court Complaint Complaint, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance with Miss. Code Ann., #4 State Court Complaint First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Notice of Appearance-J.Upchurch, L.Carmody & J.McIntosh, #6 Exhibit Defendants Charles Elliott, M.D. and Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.'s Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit Separate Answer and Defenses of Charles Elliott, M.D. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Separate Answer and Defenses of Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #9 Summons Summons - Activis Pharma, Inc. c/o Corporate Creation Network, Inc., #10 Summons Summons - Akorn, Inc. c/o Corporate Service Company, #11 Summons Summons - Endo Health Solution, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company, #12 Summons Summons - Hi-Tech Pharmacal Company c/o Corporate Service Company, #13 Summons Summons - HollisDiscount Pharmacy, Inc. c/o Jim Tucker, #14 Summons Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC c/o The Corporation Trust Company, #15 Summons Summons - Marshall Hollis, #16 Summons Summons - Par Pharmaceutical Companies c/o The Corporation Trust Company, #17 Summons Summons - Par PHarmaceutical, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, #18 Summons Summons - Purdue Pharma L.P. c/o Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., #19 Summons Summons - Purdue Pharma, Inc. c/o United Corporate Services, Inc., #20 Summons Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. c/o Corporate Creation Network, Inc., #21 Summons Summons - The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. c/o The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., #22 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process, #23 Exhibit Agreed Order Extending Time to Service Process, #24 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Charles Elliott, M.D. and Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.'s Motion to Dismiss, #25 Summons Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company, #26 Summons Summons Issued - Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A. c/o Troy R. Cappleman, #27 Exhibit Separate Amended Answer and Defenses of Charles Elliott, M.D. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #28 Exhibit Separate Amended Answer and Defenses of Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #29 Exhibit Notice of Appearance - A.Harris, #30 Exhibit Notice of Appearance - L.Reppeto, #31 Summons Endo Health Solutions, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trsut Company, #32 Summons Summons - Purdue Frederick Company c/o Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., #33 Exhibit Charles Elliott, M.D. and Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A."s Supplemental Motion to Dismiss, #34 Exhibit Charles Elliott, M.D.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #35 Exhibit Charles Elliott, M.D. and Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.'s Motion to Alter or Amend Order Extending Time to Serve Process, #36 Exhibit Notice of Suggestion of Bankrupcty and Automatic Stay of Proceedings and Notice of Preliminary Injunction Order, #37 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Thomas, Stephen)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/12/19. (bnd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Thomas, Stephen)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE STATEMENT Disclosure. (Thomas, Stephen)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT Disclosure. (Thomas, Stephen)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/6/19. (rtc)
November 6, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Akorn, Inc., Charles Elliott, MD, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc., Marshall Hollis, Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc., John Does 1-10, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., filed by Gary Carr. (tab)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. from CV2019-075, case number Circuit Court of Tippah County, Mississippi. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1736727) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Elliott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Elliott, M.D.
Represented By: David Walker Upchurch
Represented By: John Mark McIntosh
Represented By: Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akorn, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Scott Harris
Represented By: Lisa Anderson Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Scott Harris
Represented By: Lisa Anderson Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Mark Nolan Halbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.
Represented By: David Walker Upchurch
Represented By: John Mark McIntosh
Represented By: Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Carr
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Simoes
Represented By: Michael D. Greer
Represented By: Jefferson Vaughan Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?