Carr v. Hall et al
Petitioner: Anthony B. Carr
Respondent: Pelicia Hall and Jim Hood
Case Number: 3:2019cv00274
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing Fee Received: $ 5, receipt number MSN300025365 (tab)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/14/2020. (jtm)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 Supplement to Motion re #1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Anthony B. Carr. (Welikson, Laura)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 , #4 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting in part and deferring in part #1 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/7/2020. (jtm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony B. Carr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Carr IFP Declaration) (Welikson, Laura)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony B. Carr. (jtm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (jtm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony B. Carr. (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony B. Carr
Represented By: Laura Welikson
Represented By: Joseph Perkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?