Frazier v. Paulino
Plaintiff: Deliah Frazier
Defendant: Joel C. Paulino
Case Number: 3:2019cv00284
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/12/2020. (rtc)
February 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference reset for 8/17/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
February 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests by Adam Holt Johnson on behalf of Deliah Frazier to Jenessa Hicks. (Johnson, Adam)
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 9:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 2 days) (spw)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/7/2020. (rtc)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 10/13/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 3/9/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/13/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/13/2020. Motions due by 11/2/2020. Settlement Conference set for 8/10/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/7/20. (rtc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 2/7/2020. (rtc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosure Information by Adam Holt Johnson on behalf of Deliah Frazier to Jenessa Hicks. (Johnson, Adam)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Jenessa Carter Hicks on behalf of Joel C. Paulino to Plaintiff. (Hicks, Jenessa)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Docket, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Letter with Complaint, #4 Discovery Requests, #5 Summons, #6 Letter with Entry of Apperance, #7 Entry of Appearance, #8 Order, #9 Assignment Letter, #10 Order, #11 Order, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Letter with Motion to Extend Time, #14 Motion to Extend Time, #15 Letter with Order, #16 Order, #17 Letter with Affidavit of Lost Summons, #18 Affidavit of Lost Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Letter with Executed Summons, #22 Executed Summons, #23 Letter with Notice of Removal, #24 Notice of Removal) (Hicks, Jenessa)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Joel C. Paulino. (Hicks, Jenessa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 2/7/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/18/19. (rtc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Joel C. Paulino, filed by Deliah Frazier. (jla)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joel C. Paulino from Tunica County Circuit Court, case number 2019-0022. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1751291) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Joel C. Paulino. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Paulino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deliah Frazier
Represented By: Adam Holt Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel C. Paulino
Represented By: Jenessa Carter Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?