Tubwell v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Appellee: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Appellant: Joe Clyde Tubwell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00294
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/4/20. (ab)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Joe Clyde Tubwell. (jwr)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Joe Clyde Tubwell. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Joe Clyde Tubwell in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Proposed Order) (jwr)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Hold Briefing Schedule in Abeyance, MOTION for Extension of Time by Joe Clyde Tubwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A E-mail, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Hearing) (tab)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record (Additional designation) for Appellant by U.S. Bankruptcy Court. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Howell, Amanda)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record for Appellant by U. S. Bankruptcy Court. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Howell, Amanda)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Jason D. Woodard on 12/2/19. (Howell, Amanda)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Default ORDER granting relief from automatic stay. Signed by Judge Jason D. Woodard on 9/12/19. (Howell, Amanda)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Denying Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Jason D. Woodard on 9/9/19. (Howell, Amanda)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-12163-JDW. File received, filed by Joe Clyde Tubwell. Appellant Brief due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (Howell, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tubwell v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Charles Frank Fair Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joe Clyde Tubwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?