RTS Publishing Company v. Readerprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RTS Publishing Company
Defendant: Brant Reader and Readerprises, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/30/20. (bnd)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Brant Reader, Readerprises, LLC. (McDavid, Stephan)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/27/2020. (rtc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul A. Chiniche on behalf of RTS Publishing Company Brant Reader served on 1/19/2020. (Chiniche, Paul)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul A. Chiniche on behalf of RTS Publishing Company Readerprises, LLC served on 1/19/2020. (Chiniche, Paul)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephan L. McDavid on behalf of All Defendants (McDavid, Stephan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Remark: Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright forwarded to Register of Copyrights. (jwr)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1754643, filed by RTS Publishing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Copyright Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2: KNS Lecture Notes, #3 Exhibit 3: KNS Study Guide, #4 Exhibit 4: Seminar Receipt, #5 Exhibit 5: Certificate of Attendance, #6 Exhibit 6: RTZ Study Guide, #7 Exhibit 7: RTZ Exam Review, #8 Exhibit 8: Letter, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RTS Publishing Company v. Readerprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RTS Publishing Company
Represented By: Paul A. Chiniche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brant Reader
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Readerprises, LLC
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?