Coates v. Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Coates
Defendant: Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC, John Does 1-10, Marcus Morrow and Saia LTL Freight
Case Number: 3:2020cv00025
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Houston, Earl)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Marcus Morrow, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC. (Houston, Earl)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Earl W. Houston, II on behalf of Marcus Morrow, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC to All counsel of record. (Houston, Earl)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. (no document attached) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/17/2020. (rtc) Modified on 3/18/2020 (jla).
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint and First Amended Complaint by Marcus Morrow, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC. (Houston, Earl)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Allowing Attendance by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/3/2020. (rtc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Paul Christopher Peel on behalf of Tracy Coates of Filing Corrected Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) (Peel, Paul)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Tracy Coates. (Peel, Paul)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/21/2020. (jwr)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/18/2020. (rtc)
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 CORRECTED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Marcus Morrow, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC. (Houston, Earl)
February 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Marcus Morrow, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC. (Houston, Earl)
February 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl W. Houston, II on behalf of Marcus Morrow, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC (Houston, Earl)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Christopher Peel on behalf of Tracy Coates Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC served on 1/28/2020. (Peel, Paul)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Christopher Peel on behalf of Tracy Coates Marcus Morrow served on 1/25/2020. (Peel, Paul)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Marcus Morrow, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1763728, filed by Tracy Coates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
January 23, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saia LTL Freight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Coates
Represented By: Richard D. Underwood
Represented By: Paul Christopher Peel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?