Logan v. Yalobusha County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Davidtron Logan
Defendant: City of Water Valley, Mississippi, Yalobusha County, Mississippi, Deputies/Officers and Jail Employees John Does 1-6, Police Chief M.W. King, Sheriff W.F. Humphreys, Agent John Butts, Deputy Tommy West, Deputy Taylor Byford, Agent Keith Davis and Officer Richard Willhite
Case Number: 3:2020cv00050
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. John Butts answer due 4/18/2020; Keith Davis answer due 4/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/2/20. (cs)
April 1, 2020 Filing 28 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by John Butts, Keith Davis. (Miracle, Douglas)
April 1, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas T. Miracle on behalf of John Butts, Keith Davis (Miracle, Douglas)
March 23, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Davidtron Logan John Butts served on 3/20/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
March 23, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Davidtron Logan Keith Davis served on 3/20/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
March 19, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Core Disclosures by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Davidtron Logan to Defendants. (Moore, Carlos)
March 19, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference RESET for 5/20/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. (rtc)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tommy West answer due 4/18/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/18/20. (bnd)
March 18, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint by Tommy West. (Griffith, Daniel)
March 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Taylor Byford, W.F. Humphreys, Tommy West, Yalobusha County, Mississippi (Griffith, Daniel)
March 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Taylor Byford, W.F. Humphreys, Tommy West, Yalobusha County, Mississippi (Griffith, Mary)
March 18, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; W.F. Humphreys waiver sent on 3/16/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Yalobusha County, Mississippi waiver sent on 3/16/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Taylor Byford waiver sent on 3/16/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Richard Willhite waiver sent on 3/3/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; City of Water Valley, Mississippi waiver sent on 3/3/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; M.W. King waiver sent on 3/3/2020. (Moore, Carlos) Modified on 3/16/2020 (tab).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/13/2020. (rtc)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/11/2020. (jtm)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of City of Water Valley, Mississippi, M.W. King, Richard Willhite (Clark, Howard)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of City of Water Valley, Mississippi, M.W. King, Richard Willhite (Butler, Gregory)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Michael P. Mills recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 3/4/2020. (tab)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Second Amended Complaint John Butts, Taylor Byford, Keith Davis, Richard Willhite. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Davidtron Logan. (Moore, Carlos)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Davidtron Logan Tommy West served on 2/26/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tommy West. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Davidtron Logan. (Moore, Carlos)
February 13, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Water Valley, Mississippi, W.F. Humphreys, M.W. King, Yalobusha County, Mississippi. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1771736, filed by Davidtron Logan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. Yalobusha County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davidtron Logan
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Water Valley, Mississippi
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yalobusha County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputies/Officers and Jail Employees John Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Chief M.W. King
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff W.F. Humphreys
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent John Butts
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Tommy West
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Taylor Byford
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent Keith Davis
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Richard Willhite
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?