Davis et al v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Plaintiff: James Richard Davis and Teresa Tatum Davis
Defendant: The Kroger Co. and Kroger Limited Partnership I
Case Number: 3:2020cv00071
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/13/2020. (rtc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2021 10:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and/or Things Propounded to Plaintiffs by William O. Luckett, Jr on behalf of Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Luckett, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 West before Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. (kbt)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/9/2020. (rtc)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2021 10:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 1/4/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 5/11/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 10/5/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 11/5/2020. Motions due by 1/25/2021. Settlement Conference set for 8/10/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/9/2020. (rtc)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY, Kroger Limited Partnership I added. The Kroger Co. terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/9/20. (jla)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2020. (rtc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Brad Best on behalf of James Richard Davis, Teresa Tatum Davis to Defendant, The Kroger Co.. (Best, Brad)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by William O. Luckett, Jr on behalf of The Kroger Co.. (Luckett, William)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/26/2020. (rtc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Appendix General Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Appendix Fee Bill, #5 Summons Issued, #6 Summons Served, #7 Appendix Notice of Removal) (Luckett, William)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Allowing Attendance by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/5/2020. (rtc)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/5/2020. (rtc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by The Kroger Co.. (Luckett, William)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Teresa Tatum Davis, James Richard Davis. (jwr)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co. from Circuit Court of Lafayette County, Mississippi, case number L20-051. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1778635) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by The Kroger Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Richard Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey Felix Calderaro
Represented By: Brad Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Tatum Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey Felix Calderaro
Represented By: Brad Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: William O. Luckett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: William O. Luckett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?