Hunt v. City of Olive Branch
Plaintiff: Russell K. Hunt
Defendant: City of Olive Branch
Case Number: 3:2020cv00093
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint. (jla)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 Initial Order - Rule 16.1. (jwr)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher James Latimer on behalf of City of Olive Branch (Latimer, Christopher)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on June 4, 2020. (irw)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Olive Branch. (Roberts, Ronald)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Olive Branch. Returned to plaintiff for service. (jwr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300025725, filed by Russell K. Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. City of Olive Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell K. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Olive Branch
Represented By: Christopher James Latimer
Represented By: Ronald L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?