Dukes et al v. Starr et al
Plaintiff: Tyrin Dukes and Zaelon Washington
Defendant: Charles E. Starr and GEICO Employees Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00126
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by William O. Luckett, Jr on behalf of Tyrin Dukes, Zaelon Washington. (Luckett, William)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/8/2020. (irw)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Charles E. Starr (jla)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by GEICO Employees Insurance Company; filed in State Court, See Doc #5 ) (jla)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended State Court Complaint by GEICO Employees Insurance Company; (filed in State Court, See Doc #5 ). (jla)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by GEICO Employees Insurance Company (filed in State Court, See Doc #5 ). (jla)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit 11/18/2019 Summons, #4 Exhibit 11/18/2019 Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Discovery to Starr & GEICO, #5 Exhibit 11/18/2019 Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Discovery to GEICO, #6 Exhibit Notice and Acknowledgement for Service by Mail, #7 Exhibit Answer of GEICO, #8 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #9 Exhibit 01/14/2020 Notice of Service of GEICO's Responses to Requests for Admissions, #10 Exhibit Agreed Order to Amend Complaint, #11 Exhibit GEICO's Answer to First Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit 01/31/2020 Notice of Service of GEICO's interrogatories & requests for production to plaintiffs, #13 Exhibit 02/05/2020 Notice of Service of GEICO's responses to interrogatories and requests for production of documents, #14 Exhibit 02/14/2020 Summons to Starr, #15 Exhibit Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint, #16 Exhibit Driskell Entry of Appearance, #17 Exhibit Starr's Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint, #18 Exhibit 02/24/2020 Summons to Starr, #19 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint, #20 Exhibit Notice of Service of Washington's responses to interrogatories and requests for production of documents, #21 Exhibit Notice of Service of GEICO's Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #22 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Washington, #23 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #24 Exhibit Johnson Entry of Appearance, #25 Exhibit Notice of Service/Notice of Deposition of Dukes, #26 Exhibit Motion to Compel, #27 Exhibit 04/24/2020 GEICO's Answer to First Amended Complaint, #28 Exhibit Notice of Cancellation of Deposition of Washington, #29 Exhibit Second Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #30 Exhibit Notice of Mailing, #31 Exhibit GEICO's Response to Motion to Compel, #32 Exhibit Notice of Cancellation of Deposition of Dukes, #33 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #34 Exhibit Notice of Removal) (Brady, John)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Darnell Felton terminated. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/11/20. (ncb)(no document attached)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William O. Luckett, Jr on behalf of Tyrin Dukes, Zaelon Washington (Luckett, William)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Zaelon Washington. (Felton, Darnell)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT against GEICO Employees Insurance Company, Charles E. Starr, filed by Tyrin Dukes, Zaelon Washington. (tab)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO Employees Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Tate County, MS, case number 19-CV-345-SMT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1801841) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by GEICO Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C E-mail Chain, #4 Exhibit D Second Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint, #5 Exhibit E Proposed Release - Zaelon Washington, #6 Exhibit F Proposed Release - Tyrin Dukes, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes et al v. Starr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrin Dukes
Represented By: Sandra Dee Marshall
Represented By: Darnell Felton
Represented By: William O. Luckett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaelon Washington
Represented By: Sandra Dee Marshall
Represented By: Darnell Felton
Represented By: William O. Luckett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?