Williams et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Narika Williams, Clarence Williams, Jr., Adrianna Williams, Brice Thompson and Raynetta Williams
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00130
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/1/2020. (irw)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 10/18/2021 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3 days) (spw)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 12/31/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 1/29/2021. Motions due by 4/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/29/2020. (irw)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 6/26/2020. (irw)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon Flechas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Flechas, Brandon)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Grant Dalton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dalton, Matthew)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Virginia (Ginny) Y. Deliman on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Deliman, Virginia (Ginny))
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Lyle Robinson on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Robinson, Benjamin)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Philip Andrew Stroud on behalf of Brice Thompson, Adrianna Williams, Clarence Williams, Jr, Narika Williams, Raynetta Williams to Defendant, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Stroud, Philip)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Greenville Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/28/2020. (irw)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons Return, #5 Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Federal Removal) (Holwadel, Russell)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 (jla)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Holwadel, Russell)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Holwadel, Russell)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT of USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Holwadel, Russell)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against USAA Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Narika Williams, Clarence Williams, Jr, Brice Thompson, Adrianna Williams, Raynetta Williams. (tab)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Tate County, MS, case number 20-CV-89SMT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1803095) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Renewal Declarations, #2 Exhibit 2 Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties and State Court, #3 Exhibit 3 State Court Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narika Williams
Represented By: Philip Andrew Stroud
Represented By: Brandon Flechas
Represented By: Matthew Grant Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Philip Andrew Stroud
Represented By: Brandon Flechas
Represented By: Matthew Grant Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianna Williams
Represented By: Philip Andrew Stroud
Represented By: Brandon Flechas
Represented By: Matthew Grant Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brice Thompson
Represented By: Philip Andrew Stroud
Represented By: Brandon Flechas
Represented By: Matthew Grant Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynetta Williams
Represented By: Philip Andrew Stroud
Represented By: Brandon Flechas
Represented By: Matthew Grant Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell D. Holwadel
Represented By: Benjamin Lyle Robinson
Represented By: Virginia (Ginny) Y. Deliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?