Warren v. Fore
Plaintiff: Vivian Warren
Defendant: Daniel B. Fore and Daniel B. Fore, MD
Case Number: 3:2020cv00220
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 'PLAINTIFF'S RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Daniel Alan Seward on behalf of Vivian Warren to Attorney Kevin Baskette. (Seward, Daniel)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Kevin O'Neal Baskette on behalf of Daniel B. Fore to Plaintiff Vivian Warren. (Baskette, Kevin) Modified on 9/18/2020 (jla).
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Kevin O'Neal Baskette on behalf of Daniel B. Fore to Plaintiff Vivian Warren. (Baskette, Kevin)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/14/2020. (rtc)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents by Kevin O'Neal Baskette on behalf of Daniel B. Fore to Plaintiff Vivian Warren. (Baskette, Kevin)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/24/2020. (rtc)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Daniel B. Fore, M.D.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Daniel B. Fore. (Baskette, Kevin)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Alan Seward on behalf of Vivian Warren Daniel B. Fore served on 7/31/2020. (Seward, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Daniel B. Fore, emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1834007, filed by Vivian Warren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Fore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel B. Fore
Represented By: Kevin O'Neal Baskette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel B. Fore, MD
Represented By: Kevin O'Neal Baskette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Warren
Represented By: Daniel Alan Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?