Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America v. Moe's OG BBQ Oxford, LLC
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Moe's OG BBQ Oxford, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00233
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Neal B Biggers
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #22 Response to Motion, #21 Response to Motion, #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Currie, Edward) Modified on 10/6/2020 (jla).
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email correspondence) (Currie, Edward) Modified on 10/6/2020 (jla).
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Moe's OG BBQ Oxford, LLC. (Spencer, William) Modified on 10/6/2020 (jla).
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Paul Varga on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Varga, Gregory)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Edward Goldman on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Goldman, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Gregory P. Varga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/25/2020. (yf)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Stephen E. Goldman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/25/2020. (yf)
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Gregory P. Varga,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1854896) by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standiing) (Currie, Edward)
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Stephen E. Goldman,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1854890) by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standiing) (Currie, Edward)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MS SOS - Moe's Oxford, #2 Exhibit B - MS SOS - Moe's MS) (Currie, Edward)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Currie, Edward)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/14/2020. (rtc)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/10/2020. (rtc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Spencer, William)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Moe's OG BBQ Oxford, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss) (Spencer, William)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William C. Spencer on behalf of Moe's OG BBQ Oxford, LLC (Spencer, William)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Collins Spencer, Jr on behalf of Moe's OG BBQ Oxford, LLC (Spencer, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (DEFENDANT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR PURPOSES OF COORDINATION) filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Gill, Joseph)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (DEFENDANT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR PURPOSES OF COORDINATION) by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - New Case Submission - This Action, #2 Exhibit B - New Complaint Processing Email - This Action, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D - New Notice of Removal Submission - Removed Action, #5 Exhibit E - New Notice of Removal Processing Email - Removed Action) (Gill, Joseph)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Currie, Edward)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/14/20. (jla)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Moe's OG BBQ Oxford, LLC. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1839526, filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Excerpts from 2019-2020 Policy, #2 Ex. 2 - Excerpts from 2020-2021 Policy (002), #3 Ex. 3 - State of Emergency Declaration, #4 Ex. 4 - City of Oxford Civil Emergency Resolution, #5 Ex. 5 - Executive Order 1463, #6 Ex. 6 - Executive Order 1466, #7 Ex. 7 - Executive Order 1473, #8 Ex. 8 - Executive Order 1477, #9 Ex. 9 - Executive Order 1478, #10 Ex. 10 - Executive-Order 1480, #11 Ex. 11 - May 6, 2020 Letter, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
August 13, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America v. Moe's OG BBQ Oxford, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moe's OG BBQ Oxford, LLC
Represented By: William C. Spencer
Represented By: William Collins Spencer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Joseph Walter Gill
Represented By: Edward J. Currie, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Edward Goldman
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?