Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, UK v. Kimbel Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, UK
Defendant: Kimbel Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00295
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Denson Houston on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, UK (Houston, John)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in via Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/21/2020. (irw)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael W. Baxter on behalf of Kimbel Mechanical Systems, Inc. (Baxter, Michael)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kimbel Mechanical Systems, Inc.. (Taylor, Michael)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Kimbel Mechanical Systems, Inc. (jla)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Jarett M. Smith. Attorney Smith shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/16/20. (bfg)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jarett M. Smith,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1874589) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, UK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Houston, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kimbel Mechanical Systems, Inc.; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
November 12, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1873887, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, UK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, UK v. Kimbel Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimbel Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Baxter
Represented By: Michael Madison Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, UK
Represented By: John Denson Houston
Represented By: Jarett M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?