Swick et al v. Fava
Appellant: Bill Swick and Offshore, LLC
Appellee: William L. Fava
Case Number: 3:2020cv00300
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/22/2020. (sko)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time by Offshore, LLC, Bill Swick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trustee email) (Golmon, Bradley)
December 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Bankruptcy Appellee's BRIEF by William Lawrence Fava on behalf of William L. Fava Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/4/2021. (Fava, William)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Bankruptcy Appellant's BRIEF by Bradley Truett Golmon on behalf of Offshore, LLC, Bill Swick (Golmon, Bradley)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Bradley Truett Golmon on behalf of Offshore, LLC, Bill Swick Notice of Filing of Hearing Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of 10/15/2020 Hearing in Bankruptcy Court) (Golmon, Bradley)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Opinion Re: Order Granting Motion to Sell Asset Free and Clear of Liens, Interest, Encumbrances and Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. section 363. (Re: 69 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) filed by Trustee William L. Fava. Signed by Judge Jason D. Woodard on 10/22/2020. (Howell, Amanda)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-13234-JDW. File received filed by Bill Swick, Offshore, LLC. Appellant Brief due by 12/14/2020. (Howell, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swick et al v. Fava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bill Swick
Represented By: Thomas J. Suszek
Represented By: Bradley Truett Golmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Offshore, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Suszek
Represented By: Bradley Truett Golmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William L. Fava
Represented By: William Lawrence Fava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?