Grose v. Life Insurance Company of the Southwest
Plaintiff: Jamie Grose
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of the Southwest
Case Number: 3:2020cv00311
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice re #5 Notice of Rule 41(a) Voluntary Dismissal. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 1/15/20. (ab)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jeffrey Dean Leathers on behalf of Jamie Grose of Plaintiff's Rule 41(a) Voluntary Dismissal (Leathers, Jeffrey)
January 12, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b). (jla)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/18/2020. (no document attached) (rtc)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/20/2020. (rtc)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamie Grose. (jwr)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest from Circuit Court of Union County, Mississippi, case number CV-2020-170. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1877609) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
November 20, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grose v. Life Insurance Company of the Southwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Grose
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Leathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of the Southwest
Represented By: Jason Allen Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?