Security Life of Denver Insurance Company v. Nowlin et al
Plaintiff: Security Life of Denver Insurance Company
Defendant: Jerry Owen, John Kevin Vance, John Larry Nowlin and Gail Owen
Case Number: 3:2021cv00004
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to John Kevin Vance; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , First CROSSCLAIM against John Kevin Vance by Gail Owen, John Larry Nowlin, Jerry Owen. (McMillin, Joseph)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case managment conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/26/21. No document attached. (rtc)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to John Kevin Vance (jla)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) and Relief by Security Life of Denver Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Bene Change Form, #3 Exhibit Ownership Transfer Form, #4 Exhibit Nowlin Claim, #5 Exhibit Owen Claim, #6 Exhibit Vance Competing Claim Letter, #7 Exhibit Vance Claim Paperwork, #8 Exhibit JAR Declaration, #9 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Order) (Stewart, Glen)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/11/2021. (rtc)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by John Larry Nowlin, Gail Owen, Jerry Owen. (McMillin, Joseph)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Rutledge McMillin on behalf of John Larry Nowlin, Gail Owen, Jerry Owen (McMillin, Joseph)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Austin Stewart on behalf of Security Life of Denver Insurance Company (Stewart, Glen)
February 4, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #7 Summons Returned Executed; A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (jla)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Austin Stewart on behalf of Security Life of Denver Insurance Company John Kevin Vance served on 2/3/2021. (Stewart, Glen)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; John Larry Nowlin waiver sent on 1/19/2021. (Stewart, Glen)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Jerry Owen waiver sent on 1/19/2021. (Stewart, Glen)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Gail Owen waiver sent on 1/19/2021. (Stewart, Glen)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Stewart, Glen)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to attorney by email for service. (jwr)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0537-1891603, filed by Security Life of Denver Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Beneficiary Change Form, #3 Exhibit Ownership Transfer Form, #4 Exhibit Nowlin Claim, #5 Exhibit Owen Claim, #6 Exhibit Oct. 8, 2020 Vance Competing Claim Letter, #7 Exhibit Vance Claim Paperwork, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
January 5, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Security Life of Denver Insurance Company v. Nowlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Owen
Represented By: Joseph Rutledge McMillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kevin Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Larry Nowlin
Represented By: Joseph Rutledge McMillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Owen
Represented By: Joseph Rutledge McMillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security Life of Denver Insurance Company
Represented By: Glen Austin Stewart
Represented By: Darryl Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?