Murphy v. Murphy
Plaintiff: Faye Murphy
Defendant: Shannan Maria Murphy
Case Number: 3:2021cv00025
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 4/4/2022 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (mga)
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Joshua Wayne Sage on behalf of Faye Murphy to Defendant Shannan Murphy. (Sage, Joshua)
March 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (Re-Notice) - First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admissions by Brad Best on behalf of Shannan Maria Murphy to Plaintiff. (Best, Brad)
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admissions by Brad Best on behalf of Shannan Maria Murphy to Plaintiff. (Best, Brad)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Core Disclosures by Brad Best on behalf of Shannan Maria Murphy to Plaintiff. (Best, Brad)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2022 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 11/12/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 4/26/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 8/12/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 9/13/2021. Motions due by 12/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/26/2021. (rtc)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 3/26/2021. (rtc)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case managment conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/26/21. No document attached. (rtc)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/16/2021. (rtc)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Michael P. Mills recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/12/2021. (jwr)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Shannan Maria Murphy. (Best, Brad)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Shannan Maria Murphy, filed by Faye Murphy. (tab)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shannan Maria Murphy from Chancery Court of Lafayette County, Mississippi, case number 2020-544. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1907725) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Shannan Maria Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
February 11, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannan Maria Murphy
Represented By: Brad Best
Represented By: Michael Noel Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Murphy
Represented By: Joshua Wayne Sage
Represented By: Simpson Gray Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?