Acadia Insurance Company, Inc. v. AAON, Inc.
Plaintiff: Acadia Insurance Company, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: AAON, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Shandong Mede Casting Co., LTD, C.I.S. Investments, LLC doing business as Triangle Metals, Gorham/Schaffler, Inc., Mueller Streamline Co. and Mid-South Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00031
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Shandong Mede Casting Co., LTD (Third Party Complaint) (jla)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case managment conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/16/21. No document attached. (rtc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick C. Hess on behalf of Acadia Insurance Company, Inc. (Hess, Patrick)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer C.I.S. Investments, LLC answer due 4/26/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/13/21. (bnd)
April 12, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Third Party Complaint, UNOPPOSED by C.I.S. Investments, LLC. (Beasley, William)
April 9, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B. Adams on behalf of AAON, Inc. Mueller Streamline Co. served on 4/8/2021. (Adams, Robert)
April 8, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B. Adams on behalf of AAON, Inc. Mid-South Mechanical Contractors, Inc. served on 4/5/2021. (Adams, Robert)
April 8, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B. Adams on behalf of AAON, Inc. Gorham/Schaffler, Inc. served on 4/5/2021. (Adams, Robert)
April 8, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claude F. Clayton, Jr on behalf of Gorham/Schaffler, Inc. (Clayton, Claude)
April 7, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Firm by Gorham/Schaffler, Inc.. (Dearman, Dana)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER withdrawing #20 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #21 Motion to Withdraw Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/7/21. (bnd)
April 6, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw #20 MOTION for Extension of Time by Gorham/Schaffler, Inc.. (Dearman, Dana)
April 5, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time by Gorham/Schaffler, Inc., Mid-South Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Dearman, Dana)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Patrick C. Hess. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/5/21. (bnd)
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Patrick C. Hess,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1928406) by Acadia Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois) (Crawley, Timothy)
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Smith, Roy)
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B. Adams on behalf of AAON, Inc. C.I.S. Investments, LLC served on 3/20/2021. (Adams, Robert) Modified on 3/24/2021 (jla).
March 18, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 5/13/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
March 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry L. Welch, Jr on behalf of Acadia Insurance Company, Inc. (Welch, Terry)
March 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Terry L. Welch; Attorney only admitted Pro Hac in California, no further Certificate of Good Standing needed. (jla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 5/6/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Terry L. Welch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/17/2021. (yf)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Terry L. Welch,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1920329) Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois. (Crawley, Timothy)
March 17, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Terry L. Welch,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1920329); Please file a certificate of good standing from California state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (jla)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Terry L. Welch,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1920329) by Acadia Insurance Company, Inc.. (Crawley, Timothy)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Plaintiff Acadia Insurance Company, Inc. (Crawley, Timothy)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to C.I.S. Investments, LLC d/b/a Triangle Metals, Gorham/Schaffler, Inc., Mid-South Mechanical Contractors, Inc., Mueller Streamline Co., Shandong Mede Casting Co., LTD. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Gorham/Schaffler, Inc., Mid-South Mechanical Contractors, Inc., C.I.S. Investments, LLC d/b/a Triangle Metals, Shandong Mede Casting Co., LTD, Mueller Streamline Co., filed by AAON, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" State Court Complaint) (Smith, Roy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint Complaint, #3 Summons Summons to AAON executed, #4 Summons Summons to AAON, #5 Receipt fee bill, #6 Summons Assignment and Acknowledgment, #7 Defendant's Notice of Removal) (Smith, Roy)
March 8, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #5 Exhibits to Other Document; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 . (jla)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal,,, State Court File. (Smith, Roy)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by AAON, Inc.. (Smith, Roy)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/24/21. (rtc)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against AAON, Inc., filed by Acadia Insurance Company, Inc.. (jla)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AAON, Inc. from Lafayette County Circuit Court, case number L20-572. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1910198) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by AAON, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint and Notice of Acknowledgment of Service by Mail, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
February 19, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acadia Insurance Company, Inc. v. AAON, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: AAON, Inc.
Represented By: Roy A. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Robert B. Adams
Represented By: Robert F. Stacy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acadia Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Crawley
Represented By: Patrick C. Hess
Represented By: Terry L. Welch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Shandong Mede Casting Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: C.I.S. Investments, LLC doing business as Triangle Metals
Represented By: William M. Beasley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gorham/Schaffler, Inc.
Represented By: Claude F. Clayton, Jr.
Represented By: Dana Gail Dearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mueller Streamline Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mid-South Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Gail Dearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?