Hamp v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Syreeta Hamp
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2021cv00040
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Attorney William B Curtis re Doc #17 . (cb) (Main Document 20 replaced on 4/13/2021) (cb). Modified on 4/13/2021 (cb).
April 1, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 4/19/21 re #15 Order on Motion to Stay. No document attached. (rtc)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/31/21. No document attached. (rtc)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/8/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/25/21. (bnd)
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.)
March 22, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William B. Curtis (Doc #7 ) (jla)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/16/2021. (tab)
March 15, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 Joint MOTION to Stay [Joint Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines] filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay [Joint Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines] by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Hadley, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/5/21. (bnd)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Defs' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2021 11:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/1/21. (rtc)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Richard B. North, Jr, William B Curtis (jla)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFIED AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). Signed by Senior United States District Judge David G. Campbell on 2/11/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Exhibit Case Management Orders, #3 Exhibit Case Mgt Order No. 47, #4 Exhibit Daubert Orders, #5 Exhibit Deposition Designation Orders, #6 Exhibit Discovery and Privilege Orders, #7 Exhibit Discovery Orders, #8 Exhibit Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #9 Exhibit Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Exhibit Motions in Limine Orders) (jla)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03788. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 25, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
February 24, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-03788-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16974337 filed by Syreeta Hamp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamp v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syreeta Hamp
Represented By: William B Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?