Briggs et al v. Murphy-Hoffman Company et al
Plaintiff: Blacks Hauling LLC and Shari Briggs
Defendant: Murphy-Hoffman Company and Paccar, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00067
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/13/2021. (rtc)
May 13, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2022 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
May 11, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 7/18/2022 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 4 days) (spw)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/10/2021. (rtc)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2022 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 2/25/2022. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 6/10/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 11/22/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 12/22/2021. Motions due by 3/18/2022. Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2022 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/10/2021. (rtc)
May 10, 2021 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 5/10/2021. (rtc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Murphy-Hoffman Company, Paccar, Inc.. (Lallis, Danny)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case managment conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/16/21. No document attached. (rtc)
April 16, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #15 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Blacks Hauling LLC, Shari Briggs. (McMillin, Joseph) Modified on 4/16/2021 (jla).
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Blacks Hauling LLC, Shari Briggs. (McMillin, Joseph)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Anthony M. Pisciotti; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Danny C. Lallis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/12/2021. (yf)
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 EXHIBIT re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Anthony M. Pisciotti,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1929325) Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing) (Thomas, William) Modified on 4/9/2021 to link to correct motion(jwr).
April 7, 2021 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Danny C. Lallis,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1929402) Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing) (Thomas, William)
April 5, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Danny C. Lallis,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1929402); Please file a certificate of good standing from Pennsylvania state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (jla)
April 5, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Anthony M. Pisciotti,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1929325); Please file a certificate of good standing from Pennsylvania state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (jla)
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Murphy-Hoffman Company, Paccar, Inc.. (Thomas, William)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Murphy-Hoffman Company, Paccar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Blacks 2021 Annual Rpt, #3 Exhibit C - Blacks Cert of Formation, #4 Exhibit D - MHC 2020 Corp Filings, #5 Exhibit E - Southland Corp Filings, #6 Exhibit F - MHC New Truck Order, #7 Exhibit G - PACCAR Warranty) (Thomas, William)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Danny C. Lallis,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1929402) by Murphy-Hoffman Company, Paccar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Thomas, William)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Anthony M. Pisciotti,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1929325) by Murphy-Hoffman Company, Paccar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Thomas, William)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Rutledge McMillin on behalf of Blacks Hauling LLC, Shari Briggs (McMillin, Joseph)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/31/2021. (rtc)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Thomas, William)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Thomas, William)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shari Briggs, Blacks Hauling LLC. (jwr)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paccar, Inc., Murphy-Hoffman Company from Circuit Court of Union County, case number CV2021-033. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1927797) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Paccar, Inc., Murphy-Hoffman Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Service of Process, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' 12/9/20 Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
March 30, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs et al v. Murphy-Hoffman Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blacks Hauling LLC
Represented By: William O. Rutledge, III
Represented By: Joseph Rutledge McMillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Briggs
Represented By: William O. Rutledge, III
Represented By: Joseph Rutledge McMillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy-Hoffman Company
Represented By: William Polk Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Represented By: William Polk Thomas
Represented By: Anthony M. Pisciotti
Represented By: Danny C. Lallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?