Patel et al v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Snehal Patel and Darpana Patel
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00117
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/15/2021. (rtc)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GEICO Advantage Insurance Co.. (Scott, Shea) Modified on 7/16/2021 (jla).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GEICO Advantage Insurance Co. answer due 7/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/25/2021. (yf)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by GEICO Advantage Insurance Co.. (Scott, Shea)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GEICO Advantage Insurance Co. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1953911, filed by Snehal Patel, Darpana Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
June 1, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Co.
Represented By: Shea Stewart Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snehal Patel
Represented By: Philip W. Gaines
Represented By: Kenneth Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darpana Patel
Represented By: Philip W. Gaines
Represented By: Kenneth Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?