Watts DO NOT FILE v. Coleman et al
Plaintiff: Carl Watts DO NOT FILE
Defendant: Marvin Coleman, Tonya Stewart, Timothy Outlaw and MCCF - MDOC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00164
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis for Accumulating Three "Strikes" - Requiring payment of the Full Filing Fee within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 9/14/21. (cb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 DECLINATION to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. District Judge Debra M. Brown no longer assigned to the case. (cb)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 8/25/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/26/21. (cb)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl Watts DO NOT FILE. (cb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, Jury Demand, filed by Carl Watts DO NOT FILE. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts DO NOT FILE v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Watts DO NOT FILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCF - MDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?