Pettit v. City of Oxford, Mississippi
Plaintiff: Judy M. Pettit
Defendant: City of Oxford, Mississippi
Case Number: 3:2021cv00176
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Judy M. Pettit City of Oxford, Mississippi served on 8/31/2021. (Waide, Jim)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/3/21. (jla)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Oxford, Mississippi answer due 10/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/2/21. (ncb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by City of Oxford, Mississippi. (Bland, Mallory)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of City of Oxford, Mississippi (Butler, Gregory)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Oxford, Mississippi. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1982938, filed by Judy M. Pettit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B: Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
August 10, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettit v. City of Oxford, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy M. Pettit
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oxford, Mississippi
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?