Robinson v. United States of America et al.
Plaintiff: Anthony Robinson
Defendant: United States of America, S. Harjl, G.A. Aguirre, Hernandez and Runke
Case Number: 3:2021cv00193
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT A #10 Complaint. (cb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #12 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Robinson. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (cb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #13 ORDER directing Clerk to close this civil case; and directing Clerk to re-file pleadings as a MOTION for Compassionate Release and/or MOTION for Reduction of Sentence in criminal matter 3:19cr99-DMB-DAS. (cb)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Clerk to close this civil case; and directing Clerk to re-file pleadings as a MOTION for Compassionate Release and/or MOTION for Reduction of Sentence in criminal matter 3:19cr99-DMB-DAS. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 9/1/21. (jla)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 9/30/2021.. Signed by Clerk on 8/30/21. (jla)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement,, filed by Anthony Robinson (filed in Texas Western, see Doc #1 ). (jla)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00128. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the instant case be TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi, Oxford Division. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 Inmate Trust Account Statement filed by Anthony Robinson. (dc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 ***Correspondence to the Court (dc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 ***Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (ep1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt of #3 Certified Mailing (dc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Mailing of #2 Order (dc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Plaintiff to file the financial statement required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty-one (21) days of receipt of this Order. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (dc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.]
June 3, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Miguel A. Torres.. Referral Judge: Miguel A. Torres. (mt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(dc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.] Modified on 8/30/2021 (jla).
June 2, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (dc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. United States of America et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Harjl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.A. Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Runke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?