Loyd v. Como Consolidated Gin Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Contrena Loyd
Defendant: Como Consolidated Gin Company, Inc. and Wytisha Echols
Case Number: 3:2021cv00197
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 1/6/2022 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Como Consolidated Gin Company, Inc.. (Dunbar, David)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #7 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #7 Amended Complaint by Wytisha Echols. (Dunbar, David)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David P. Pitre on behalf of Contrena Loyd Wytisha Echols served on 9/23/2021. (Pitre, David)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Como Consolidated Gin Company, Inc., Wytisha Echols, Jury Demand, filed by Contrena Loyd. (Pitre, David)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Como Consolidated Gin Company, Inc.. (Dunbar, David)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2021 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/20/2021. (rtc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Gerrard Dunnells on behalf of Como Consolidated Gin Company, Inc. (Dunnells, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David P. Pitre on behalf of Contrena Loyd Como Consolidated Gin Company, Inc. served on 9/13/2021. (Pitre, David)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to attorney by mail for service. (jwr)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number MSN300028052, filed by Contrena Loyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
September 2, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loyd v. Como Consolidated Gin Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contrena Loyd
Represented By: David P. Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Como Consolidated Gin Company, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher Gerrard Dunnells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wytisha Echols
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?