Conley, Jr. v. Wortham
Plaintiff: Lee Conley, Jr.
Defendant: Kenneth Wortham, Johnny McDonald, Brenda and Lafayette County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv00198
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #15 Order on Motion for Discovery. (cb)
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #13 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Complaint. (cb)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion #4 for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/16/21. (cb)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 11/18/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/13/21. (cb)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/13/21. (cb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #6 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Lee Conley, Jr.. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Submit Amended Complaint. (cb)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 Supplement to #3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lee Conley, Jr. (cb)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Complaint. (cb)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Submit Amended Complaint using the Enclosed Standard form within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/3/21. (cb)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 10/3/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/3/21. (cb)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Lee Conley, Jr. (cb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lee Conley, Jr. (cb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (cb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Lee Conley, Jr.. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley, Jr. v. Wortham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Conley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Wortham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?