Jackson v. DeSoto County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Tracy L. Jackson
Defendant: DeSoto County, Mississippi and Bennie Hopkins
Case Number: 3:2021cv00205
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; DeSoto County, Mississippi waiver sent on 10/8/2021. (Waide, Jim)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Bennie Hopkins waiver sent on 10/8/2021. (Waide, Jim)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2021 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/10/21. (rtc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of DeSoto County, Mississippi, Bennie Hopkins (Allen, R.)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendant Bennie Hopkins, c/o Jeff Allen, Esq. (per request) on 10/8/2021 by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Tracy L. Jackson. Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2021. (Waide, Jim)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendant DeSoto County, Mississippi, c/o Jeff Allen, Esq. (per request) on 10/8/2021 by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Tracy L. Jackson. Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2021. (Waide, Jim)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2001385, filed by Tracy L. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B: Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
September 17, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. DeSoto County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy L. Jackson
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Ronnie Lee Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeSoto County, Mississippi
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennie Hopkins
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?