Gilmore v. Morgan Van Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brandy Gilmore
Defendant: Morgan Van Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00211
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE STATEMENT Disclosure. (Herring, Calvin)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/1/2021. (rtc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Morgan Van Lines, Inc.. (Herring, Calvin)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Morgan Van Lines, Inc. waiver sent on 10/5/2021. (Watson, Louis) (main document replaced with flattened pdf version of same on 10/6/2021) (cb). Modified on 10/6/2021 (cb).
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Brandy Gilmore (Norris, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Brandy Gilmore (Norris, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Morgan Van Lines, Inc. Returned to attorney via email for service. (jwr)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2007393, filed by Brandy Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B-EEOC RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
October 1, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Please disregard document due to error; Attorney will refile. (jwr)
October 1, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Morgan Van Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Gilmore
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Calvin Paige Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?