Bradley v. State of Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Shamar Bradley
Defendant: State of Mississippi, County of Lafayette and City of Oxford
Case Number: 3:2021cv00212
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to City of Oxford, County of Lafayette, State of Mississippi. Forwarded to U S Marshal for Service. (tab) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/12/2021) (tab).
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting (2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting (8) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in case 3:21-cv-00212-NBB-RP; granting (2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting (8) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in case 3:21-cv-00213-NBB-RP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/8/21. Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00212-NBB-RP, 3:21-cv-00213-NBB-RP (bnd)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shamar Bradley. Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00212-NBB-RP, 3:21-cv-00213-NBB-RP (jtm)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Oxford, County of Lafayette, State of Mississippi,, filed by Shamar Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00212-NBB-RP, 3:21-cv-00213-NBB-RP (jtm)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00212-NBB-RP, 3:21-cv-00213-NBB-RP (jtm)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/26/2021. Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00212-NBB-RP, 3:21-cv-00213-MPM-RP (jwr)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/8/21. (bnd)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shamar Bradley. (tab)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by Shamar Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/1/2021) (tab). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2021: #2 Exhibit A Lafayette County Circuit Court Documents) (tab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. State of Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamar Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?