Holloman Corporation v. Cowan
Plaintiff: Holloman Corporation
Defendant: Justin A. Cowan
Case Number: 3:2021cv00215
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Justin A. Cowan. (Getz, Joseph)
November 11, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Justin A. Cowan waiver sent on 10/12/2021. (Stover, Joshua)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Justin A. Cowan (jla)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy K. Knaebel on behalf of Holloman Corporation (Knaebel, Jeremy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John P. Miller on behalf of Holloman Corporation (Miller, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney John P. Miller; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Jeremy K. Knaebel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/25/2021. (yf)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jeremy K. Knaebel,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2015891) by Holloman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing) (Stover, Joshua)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney John P. Miller,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2015877) by Holloman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Stover, Joshua)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Gatlin, Cheri)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Justin A. Cowan; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2009706, filed by Holloman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vulcan Credit Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
October 6, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloman Corporation v. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holloman Corporation
Represented By: Cheri Turnage Gatlin
Represented By: Joshua Wayne Stover
Represented By: Jeremy K. Knaebel
Represented By: John P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin A. Cowan
Represented By: Joseph T. Getz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?