Clark v. McAllister, et al
Plaintiff: Candra Clark
Defendant: Karl Gillard and Robert Q. Whitwell
Respondent: Chris McAllister
Case Number: 3:2021cv00219
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 12/30/2021. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/21. (cb)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cb)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #6 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to complete and return the complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 on form. (cb)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 Letter/Correspondence from Candra Clark. (cb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Response to #6 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to complete and return the complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 on form. (cb)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to complete and return the complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 on form within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/1/21. (cb)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Candra Clark. (cb)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #3 ORDER requiring the Petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit a completed in forma pauperis request including inmate account information. (cb)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring the Petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit a completed in forma pauperis request including inmate account information within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/12/21. (cb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Tippah County), filed by Candra Clark. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. McAllister, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candra Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Gillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Q. Whitwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?