Cobb v. Gold et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Cobb
Defendant: Allan Benjamin Gold and Gold Anchor Transport Service, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00258
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Jay Marshall Atkins on behalf of Gold Anchor Transport Service, LLC to Plaintiff. (Atkins, Jay)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/2/22. (rtc)
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2023 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
January 31, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 2/27/2023 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 West before Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. (kbt) (Main Document 11 replaced on 2/1/2022) (jla).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER sealing documents and directing parties to refile in redacted form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/31/2022. (yf)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/31/2022. (rtc)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2023 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 10/6/2022. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 3/3/2022. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/1/2022. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/1/2022. Motions due by 10/27/2022. Settlement Conference set for 10/12/2022 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/31/2022. (rtc)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 1/31/2022. (rtc)
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Docket Report, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Service, #5 Proof of Service) (Montgomery, Mason) (Redacted documents added on 2/4/2022 pursuant to Order #10 : #6 Redacted Certificate of State Court Clerk, #7 Redacted Docket Report, #8 Redacated State Court Complaint, #9 Redacted Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Redacted Notice of Service, #11 Redacted Proof of Service) (jtm).
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Admissions by Mason Scott Montgomery on behalf of Allan Benjamin Gold. (Montgomery, Mason) (Redacted document added on 2/4/2022 pursuant to Order #10 : #1 Redacted Notice of Service) (jtm).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Allan Benjamin Gold, Gold Anchor Transport Service, LLC. (Montgomery, Mason) (Redacted document added on 2/4/2022 pursuant to Order #10 : #1 Redacted Answer to State Court Complaint) (jtm).
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2022 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/27/2021. (rtc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Allan Benjamin Gold, Gold Anchor Transport Service, LLC, filed by Carolyn Cobb. (jtm) (Redacted document added on 2/4/2022 pursuant to Order #10 : #1 Redacted State Court Complaint) (jtm).
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gold Anchor Transport Service, LLC, Allan Benjamin Gold from Circuit Court of DeSoto County, Mississippi, case number CI 2021-366. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2041459) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Gold Anchor Transport Service, LLC, Allan Benjamin Gold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Return, #3 Exhibit D - State Court Removal, #4 Exhibit E - Secretary of State Filing, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm) (Redacted documents added on 2/4/2022 pursuant to Order #10 : #6 Redacted Notice of Removal, #7 Redacted Exhibit A, #8 Redacted Exhibit B, #9 Redacted Exhibit C, #10 Redacted Exhibit D, #11 Redacted Exhibit E, #12 Redacted Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm).
December 22, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Gold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Cobb
Represented By: Brandon S. Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Benjamin Gold
Represented By: Camp Pittman
Represented By: Mason Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Anchor Transport Service, LLC
Represented By: Camp Pittman
Represented By: Mason Scott Montgomery
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?