Watts v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Monica Watts
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2022cv00057
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/12/2022. (jwr)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per Order #5 . No further order will issue from the court. (No document is attached). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/5/2022. (ck)
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; forwarded to USM for service. (jla)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appeal in forma pauperis; directing Clerk to issue process and USM to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/3/22. (jla)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Monica Watts. (McHenry, Michael)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/28/2022. (jwr)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Monica Watts. (jwr)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Monica Watts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
April 14, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Watts
Represented By: Michael Burnis McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?