Forsythe et al v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: Robin Forsythe and Lisa Forsythe
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack, United States Department of Agriculture, Marcia Bunger and United States Risk Management Agency
Case Number: 3:2022cv00112
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act - Right of Review
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Risk Management Agency answer due 9/5/2022; Thomas J. Vilsack answer due 8/23/2022. (jla)
July 19, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W. Thomas McCraney, III on behalf of Robin Forsythe, Lisa Forsythe Thomas J. Vilsack served on 6/24/2022. (McCraney, W.)
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W. Thomas McCraney, III on behalf of Robin Forsythe, Lisa Forsythe United States Risk Management Agency served on 7/7/2022. (McCraney, W.)
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Thomas J. Vilsack, United States Department of Agriculture, Marcia Bunger, and United States Risk Management Agency (jla)
June 30, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Lisa Forsythe, Robin Forsythe. (McCraney, W.)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lisa Forsythe, Robin Forsythe. (McCraney, W.)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Lisa Forsythe, Robin Forsythe. (McCraney, W.)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
June 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Marcia Bunger, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Risk Management Agency, and Thomas J. Vilsack; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2108432, filed by Robin Forsythe, Lisa Forsythe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2nd Notice of Suspension, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lisa's Ntc of Suspension, #3 Exhibit 3 - Robin's Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Lisa's Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Exemplar Customer Statement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Exemplar Customer Statement, #8 Exhibit 8 - Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 - Docket, #10 Exhibit 10 - Diversified Letter, #11 Exhibit 11 - Lisa's License, #12 Exhibit 12 - Transcript, #13 Exhibit 13 - 1st Suspension Notice, #14 Exhibit 14 - SAMS Exclusion - Robin's 1st, #15 Exhibit 15 - Robin's Discovery Response, #16 Exhibit 16 - Lisa's Deposition Excerpts, #17 Exhibit 17 - Robin's License, #18 Exhibit 18 - Settlement Agreement, #19 Exhibit 19 - SAMs Exclusion - Robin's 2nd, #20 Exhibit 20 - SAMs Exclusion - Lisa, #21 Exhibit 21 - Robin's Response to Notice, #22 Exhibit 22 - Lisa's Response to Notice, #23 Exhibit 23 - Confirmation of Receipt of Responses, #24 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
June 15, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forsythe et al v. Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Forsythe
Represented By: W. Thomas McCraney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Forsythe
Represented By: W. Thomas McCraney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Bunger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Risk Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?