Clayton v. First Heritage Credit et al
Plaintiff: James Clayton
Defendant: First Heritage Credit and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00131
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (jla)
August 29, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b). (jla)
August 18, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Agreed). (Warren, Joseph)
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement - Pending as to First Heritage Credit (all Defendants) by Thomas J. Bellinder on behalf of James Clayton (Bellinder, Thomas)
July 19, 2022 NOTICE cancelling Telephonic Case Management Conference re #4 Initial Order - Rule 16.1. (irw)
July 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Core Disclosures by Thomas J. Bellinder on behalf of James Clayton to All Defendants. (Bellinder, Thomas)
July 18, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Bellinder, Thomas)
July 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement - Pending as to Defendant Equifax by Thomas J. Bellinder on behalf of James Clayton (Bellinder, Thomas)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 7/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/11/22. (irw)
July 8, 2022 Filing 3 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by First Heritage Credit. (Warren, Joseph)
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, First Heritage Credit, filed by James Clayton. (jla)
July 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Heritage Credit from DeSoto County Circuit Court, case number CI 2022-209 GCD. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2114848) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by First Heritage Credit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Copy of State Court Record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
July 1, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. First Heritage Credit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clayton
Represented By: Thomas J. Bellinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Heritage Credit
Represented By: Jonathan Hoyt Still
Represented By: Joseph Lott Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?