Melton et al v. Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated
Plaintiff: David B. Melton, 247 Farms, Inc. and Pea Patch Road Farms LLP
Defendant: Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2022cv00161
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 11/6/2023 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Bankruptcy Courthouse - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (tjw)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/23/22. (rtc)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2023 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 3/22/2023. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 10/24/2022. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 12/21/2022. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/6/2023. Motions due by 4/12/2023. Settlement Conference set for 3/23/2023 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/23/22. (rtc)
September 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for Production of Documents or Things from Plaintiffs to Defendant by Jeffrey S. Dilley on behalf of 247 Farms, Inc., David B. Melton, Pea Patch Road Farms LLP to Counsel for Defendant. (Dilley, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories from Plaintiffs to Defendant by Jeffrey S. Dilley on behalf of 247 Farms, Inc., David B. Melton, Pea Patch Road Farms LLP to Counsel for Defendant. (Dilley, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2022 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 9/22/2022. (rtc)
September 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Jeffrey S. Dilley on behalf of 247 Farms, Inc., David B. Melton, Pea Patch Road Farms LLP to Counsel for Defendant. (Dilley, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures by David L. Ayers on behalf of Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated to Plaintiffs. (Ayers, David)
August 1, 2022 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL Ltr to Circ Clerk, #3 Exhibit C - Summons - Great Plains, #4 Exhibit D - Order, #5 Exhibit E - Circ Clerk Ltr, #6 Exhibit F - Order, #7 Exhibit G - Order, #8 Exhibit H - Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit I - NOF NOR (Circuit)) (Ayers, David)
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Ayers, David)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated. (Ayers, David)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2022 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/29/22. (rtc)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Defendant Great Plains Manufacturing, Inc. (Ayers, David)
July 28, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated, filed by David B. Melton, 247 Farms, Inc., Pea Patch Road Farms LLP. (jla)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated from Tunica County Circuit Court, case number 2022-0080. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2123785) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents served on Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
July 28, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melton et al v. Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Melton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Dilley
Represented By: William Kurt Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 247 Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Dilley
Represented By: William Kurt Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pea Patch Road Farms LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Dilley
Represented By: William Kurt Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated
Represented By: David L. Ayers
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?