The Raymond Corporation v. Warshauer Law Group, P.C. et al
Petitioner: The Raymond Corporation
Respondent: Warshauer Law Group, PC and Michael J. Warshauer
Case Number: 3:2022mc00004
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #1 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/22/2022. (yf)
June 29, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #19 Response in Support of Motion to Compel filed by The Raymond Corporation. (LoCoco, Francis)
June 29, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re #1 of its Motion to Compel filed by The Raymond Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 22MC80074 #20 Docket Entry 05-02-2022) (LoCoco, Francis)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Application to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice re Francis H. LoCoco and Margaret K. Heitkamp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/28/22. (jla)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #1 MOTION to Compel. Replies due by 6/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/24/2022. (yf)
June 22, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 Objection, #1 Motion to Compel. (Bass, Yeager)
June 22, 2022 Filing 15 Objection to #1 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R. Jones Depo. Excerpt, #2 Exhibit Raymond Resp. to Inter. 5) (Bass, Yeager)
June 21, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1 MOTION to Compel by The Raymond Corporation. (Tannehill, J.) Modified on 6/22/2022 (jla).
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Rhea Tannehill, Jr on behalf of The Raymond Corporation (Tannehill, J.)
June 21, 2022 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #11 Objection, #12 Memorandum in Support; All exhibits should be filed with the response to which they relate and not the memorandum brief, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). Attorney to refile response and memorandum brief. (jla)
June 15, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #11 Objection, #12 Memorandum in Support; All exhibits should be filed with the response to which they relate and not the memorandum brief, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). Attorney to refile response and memorandum brief. (jla)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 Objection, #1 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R. Jones Depo. Excerpt, #2 Exhibit Raymond Response to Interrog No. 5) (Bass, Yeager)
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 Objection to #1 Motion to Compel. (Bass, Yeager)
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yeager Matthews Bass on behalf of Michael J. Warshauer, Warshauer Law Group, PC (Bass, Yeager)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice as to Michael J. Warshauer (jla)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice as to Samantha A. Lunn, Jasper V. Abbott, and Trent Shuping (jla)
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:22-mi-00036. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Consent Motion to Transfer Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this miscellaneous action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi, civil action no. 3:20-cv-308-MPM-RP. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/13/2022. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]
June 14, 2022 Case electronically transferred to USDC Northern District of Mississippi, civil action no. 3:20-cv-308-MPM-RP. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]
June 14, 2022 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE re Submission to Magistrate Judge - The Raymond Corporation's Non-Opposition to Subpoena Respondents' Notice of Consent to Transfer to Issuing Court and Motion to Transfer to Issuing Court filed by The Raymond Corporation. (Lunn, Samantha) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]
June 9, 2022 Submission of #4 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court-Northern District of Mississippi, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court-Northern District of Mississippi by Michael J. Warshauer, Warshauer Law Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Docket)(Shuping, Trent) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Trent Shuping on behalf of Michael J. Warshauer, Warshauer Law Group, P.C. (Shuping, Trent) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Raymond Consolidated Corporation for The Raymond Corporation by The Raymond Corporation.(Lunn, Samantha) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Subpoenas to Produce Documents with Brief In Support by The Raymond Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief The Raymond Corporation's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Compel Production Pursuant to Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Francis H. LoCoco in Support of The Raymond Corporation's Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit A - Report of John Meyer dated 10-4-2021, #4 Exhibit B - Cited Excerpts from Deposition of John Meyer taken 12-09-2021, #5 Exhibit C - Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition directed to Ray Rivera dated 2-15-2022, #6 Exhibit D - Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition directed to Corsi Investigations LLC dated 2-15-2022, #7 Exhibit E - Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena with exhibits, #8 Exhibit F - The Raymond Corporation's Second Amended Notices of Deposition for Corsi Investigations LLC and Ray Rivera dated 02-18-2022, #9 Exhibit G - Deposition Transcript of Raymond Rivera taken 02-23-2022, #10 Exhibit H - Report of Corsi Investigations, LLC, dated 03-30-2021, #11 Exhibit I - Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises directed to Michael Warshauer dated 04-01-2022, #12 Exhibit J - Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises directed to Warshauer Law Group, P.C., dated 04-01-2022, #13 Exhibit K - Affidavits of Service from process server confirming service on 04-06-2022, #14 Exhibit L - Objections of Warshauer Law Group to Subpoena filed 04-20-2022, #15 Exhibit M - Objections of Michael Warshauer to Subpoena filed 04-20-2022, #16 Exhibit N - Letter from LoCoco to Warshauer dated 04-12-2022, #17 Exhibit O - Email from LoCoco to Warshauer dated 04-26-2022, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11835979 (nmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Raymond Corporation v. Warshauer Law Group, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Raymond Corporation
Represented By: Samantha A. Lunn
Represented By: Francis H. LoCoco
Represented By: J. Rhea Tannehill, Jr.
Represented By: Margaret K. Heitkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warshauer Law Group, PC
Represented By: Jasper V. Abbott
Represented By: Michael J. Warshauer
Represented By: Yeager Matthews Bass
Represented By: Trent Shuping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael J. Warshauer
Represented By: Jasper V. Abbott
Represented By: Michael J. Warshauer
Represented By: Yeager Matthews Bass
Represented By: Trent Shuping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?