Chong v. Security Credit Services LLC
Plaintiff: Cheynne Chong
Defendant: Security Credit Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00014
Filed: January 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Security Credit Services LLC answer due 3/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/16/2023. (yf)
February 24, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Security Credit Services LLC. (Culp, H.)
February 8, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Security Credit Services LLC served on 2/7/2023. (tab)
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Security Credit Services LLC; forwarded to USM for service. (jla)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/6/23. (bnd)
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Cheynne Chong. (jla)
February 3, 2023 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order to Show Cause. (jla)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/19/23. (bnd)
January 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
January 17, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cheynne Chong. (jla)
January 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by Cheynne Chong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chong v. Security Credit Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheynne Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Credit Services LLC
Represented By: H. Richmond Culp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?