Brown et al v. Boyd et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Clemons and Jessica Brown
Defendant: United States of America and Timothy Boyd
Case Number: 3:2024cv00162
Filed: June 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Oliver Earl Clark, Jr on behalf of Jessica Brown, Jesse Clemons (Clark, Oliver)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. United States of America's answer now due 10/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/24/2024. (bbf)
July 24, 2024 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Davis, Stuart)
July 23, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Luke Benedict on behalf of United States of America (Benedict, Joseph)
July 23, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart Davis on behalf of United States of America (Davis, Stuart)
July 18, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine J. Malycke on behalf of United States of America (Malycke, Catherine)
July 17, 2024 Filing 9 Letter of Introduction of Catherine J. Malycke as counsel for the United States of America (jwr)
July 2, 2024 Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer due 8/9/2024. (jwr)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER substituting party defendant and amending caption. United States of America added. United States Postal Service terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/1/2024. (jwr)
July 1, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Oliver Earl Clark, Jr on behalf of Jessica Brown, Jesse Clemons of Substitution of Defendant (Clark, Oliver)
June 24, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Earl Clark, Jr on behalf of Jessica Brown, Jesse Clemons United States Postal Service served on 6/12/2024. (Clark, Oliver)
June 18, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Earl Clark, Jr on behalf of Jessica Brown, Jesse Clemons (Clark, Oliver)
June 14, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Earl Clark, Jr on behalf of Jessica Brown, Jesse Clemons United States Postal Service served on 6/10/2024. (Clark, Oliver)
June 14, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Earl Clark, Jr on behalf of Jessica Brown, Jesse Clemons Timothy Boyd served on 6/7/2024. (Clark, Oliver)
June 3, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Timothy Boyd, United States Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.A. Attorney General. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jwr)
June 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2395821, filed by Jessica Brown, Jesse Clemons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/4/2024 with document rotated right side up) (jla).
June 3, 2024 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Clemons
Represented By: Oliver Earl Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Brown
Represented By: Oliver Earl Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stuart Davis
Represented By: Joseph Luke Benedict
Represented By: Catherine J. Malycke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?