USA v. G'wood Public Sch
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Greenwood Public School District
Case Number: 4:1966cv00040
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Leflore
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Unitary Status. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/15/2019. (kab)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Joint Motion for reopening of school. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/21/2017. (dbm)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/30/2015. (psk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. G'wood Public Sch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Calvin D. Buchanan
Represented By: Emily H. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Public School District
Represented By: Richard A. Oakes
Represented By: Carlos Diallo Palmer
Represented By: Willie J. Perkins, Sr.
Represented By: Alix H. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?