Seiferth v. Helicopteros Atunero, et al

Case Number: 4:2003cv00463
Filed: December 30, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
Presiding Judge: Eugene M. Bogen
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Airline Crash
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 9/29/2009. (pbs, USDC)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 54 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Affirming Magistrate's Order. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 12/12/2008. (pbs, USDC)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 46 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by David A. Sanders on 11/7/2008. (maw, USDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seiferth v. Helicopteros Atunero, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?