Electronic Controls, Inc. v. Amtel Security Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Electronic Controls, Inc.
Defendant: Amtel Security Systems, Inc. and Doorguard Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2007cv00046
Filed: March 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Sunflower
Presiding Judge: Eugene M. Bogen
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 AMENDED ORDER correcting #129 Order. Signed by David A. Sanders on 4/6/11. (ncb)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying 128 Motion to proceed pro se. Signed by David A. Sanders on 4/6/11. (ncb)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 98 Motion in Limine. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 9/30/2009. (pbs, USDC)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 107 Motion to Strike. Defendant is prohibited from offering subject information for trial. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 9/28/2009. (pbs, USDC)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 91 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 9/09/09. (pbs, USDC)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 84 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by David A. Sanders on 6/5/2009. (maw, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Controls, Inc. v. Amtel Security Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Patrick Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtel Security Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doorguard Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?