Thorson v. Epps et al
Plaintiff: Roger Thorson
Defendant: Christopher Epps and Lawrence Kelly
Case Number: 4:2008cv00129
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Sunflower
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 7/13/2011. (pls)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 48 MOTION to Continue TRIAL DATE AND EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINES filed by Lawrence Kelly, Christopher Epps, Jim Hood Discovery due by 1/24/2011. Motions due by 2/7/2011.. Signed by David A. Sanders on 11/18/2010. (sef, USDC)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER terminating 40 Motion for site inspection. Signed by David A. Sanders on 10/1/10. (ncb, USDC)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER requiring the defendants to answer the complaint within 10 days of this date. Signed by David A. Sanders on 8/25/09. (ncb, USDC)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 6/22/2009. (pbs, USDC)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING CASE pending resolution of the defendants' Motion to Dismiss. In the event the motion is denied, plaintiff shall then submit to the magistrate judge an order lifting stay. Signed by David A. Sanders on 11/20/2008. (maw, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorson v. Epps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Thorson
Represented By: James L. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Epps
Represented By: Jason L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Kelly
Represented By: Jason L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?