Williams et al v. Epps et al
Plaintiff: Samuel T. Williams, Kourtney Bynum, Donald Reed, Sr. and Judy Thompson
Defendant: Christopher Epps, John Doe, Richard Roe and John Doe Corporations, 1-10
Case Number: 4:2008cv00163
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Rankin
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 50 Order on Motion to Continue Defendants Designation of Experts due by 10/20/2010. Discovery due by 11/19/2010. Motions due by 12/3/2010. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 9/27/2010.. Signed by David A. Sanders on 9/17/2010. (sef, USDC)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER LIFTING STAY and extending time for service of process. Signed by David A. Sanders on 6/23/10. (ncb, USDC)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff is instructed to serve Defendant Taylor by June 8, 2010. Signed by David A. Sanders on 5/25/2010. (sef)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Strike. Signed by David A. Sanders on 11/12/2009. (sef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Epps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel T. Williams
Represented By: Casey Langston Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kourtney Bynum
Represented By: Casey Langston Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Reed, Sr.
Represented By: Casey Langston Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Thompson
Represented By: Casey Langston Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?