Stafford v. Kelly et al
Plaintiff: Roy Stafford
Defendant: Lawrence Kelly, Emitt L. Sparkman, Gloria Perry, James Burke and David Petrie
Case Number: 4:2009cv00133
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Sunflower
Presiding Judge: Jerry A. Davis
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 88 Report and Recommendations, 90 Motion to Alter Judgment filed by Roy Stafford. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 7/5/2011. (pls)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 28 . Defendants Kelly, Sparkman, and Petrie are dismissed from this case with prejudice. Plaintiff's complaints against the remaining defendants, Dr. Gloria Perry and Dr. James Burke, will PROCEED. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 5/26/10. (cr, USDC)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration re 19 Memorandum Opinion, 18 Order on Motion for TRO. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 5/21/2010. (pls, USDC)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 18 Final Judgment on Motion for TRO. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 2/26/2010. (pbs, USDC)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 15 Objection (appeal) re 11 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 2/16/2010. (pbs, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emitt L. Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Petrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?