McClenton v. Cannon Chevrolet, Cadillac, Nissan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Georgia McClenton
Defendant: Cannon Chevrolet, Cadillac, Nissan Inc. and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv00183
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Coahoma
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AGREED ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/23/2018. (adm)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Joinder. Within fourteen (14) days of this date, Plaintiff Georgia McClenton shall amend the complaint to add Christopher McClenton as a party plaintiff. However, if Mr. McClenton refuses to be joined as a plaintiff, within the same time frame, plaintiff shall amend the complaint to add Mr. McClenton as a party-defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/4/17. (bfg)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/11/17. (bfg)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 31 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/28/2017. (adm)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss CLAIM FOR LOSS OF VEHICLE without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/28/2017. (adm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClenton v. Cannon Chevrolet, Cadillac, Nissan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia McClenton
Represented By: Ralph E. Chapman
Represented By: Oliver Earl Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Dana J. Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannon Chevrolet, Cadillac, Nissan Inc.
Represented By: Richard McLure Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Reed C. Darsey
Represented By: William C. Hammack
Represented By: Meagan Olivia Linton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?